MI SB0259 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-19 - Referred To Committee On Families And Children's Services
Pending: House Families And Children's Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-19 - Referred To Committee On Families And Children's Services
Pending: House Families And Children's Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Children; protection; state child advocacy council; create. Creates new act. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0257'09
Title
Children; protection; state child advocacy council; create. Creates new act. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0257'09
Sponsors
Sen. Patricia Birkholz [R] | Sen. Alan Cropsey [R] | Rep. Judson Gilbert [R] | Sen. Bill Hardiman [R] |
Sen. Mark Jansen [R] | Sen. Roger Kahn [R] | Sen. John Pappageorge [R] | Sen. Randy Richardville [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-03-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 2 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-19 | Referred To Committee On Families And Children's Services | |
2009-03-19 | Read A First Time | |
2009-03-19 | Received On 03/19/2009 | |
2009-03-19 | Passed Roll Call # 66 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | |
2009-03-18 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 | |
2009-03-18 | Substitute S-1 Concurred In | |
2009-03-18 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 | |
2009-03-12 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | |
2009-03-12 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | |
2009-03-12 | Reported Favorably Without Amendment | |
2009-02-18 | Referred To Committee On Families And Human Services |
Subjects
Children, protection
Children, services
Health, children
Health, death
Legislature, legislative agencies
Legislature, other
State agencies (existing), human services
Children, services
Health, children
Health, death
Legislature, legislative agencies
Legislature, other
State agencies (existing), human services