MI SB0278 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-24 - Assigned Pa 0093'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-24 - Assigned Pa 0093'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Traffic control: driver license; designation as an individual with a communication impediment; allow in vehicle registration, and operator's and chauffeur's license, and provide for law enforcement access. Amends secs. 221 & 310 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.221 & 257.310).
Title
Traffic control: driver license; designation as an individual with a communication impediment; allow in vehicle registration, and operator's and chauffeur's license, and provide for law enforcement access. Amends secs. 221 & 310 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.221 & 257.310).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call: Roll Call # 170 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 231 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 244 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 231 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 244 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-24 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0093'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 06/23/2020 03:14 Pm |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Approved By Governor 06/23/2020 02:33 Pm |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Presented To Governor 06/17/2020 01:25 Pm |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Roll Call: Roll Call # 170 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-06-11 | Senate | House Substitute (h-1) Concurred In |
2020-06-10 | House | Returned To Senate |
2020-06-10 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2020-06-10 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 231 Yeas 108 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2020-06-10 | House | Amended |
2020-06-10 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-05-27 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2020-05-27 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-05-19 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-05-19 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2020-03-10 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1) |
2019-10-16 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2019-10-16 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-10-16 | House | Received On 10/16/2019 |
2019-10-16 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 244 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2019-10-10 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-2) |
2019-10-10 | Senate | Substitute (s-2) Concurred In |
2019-10-10 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-2) |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-2) |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-2) |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Tom Barrett |
2020-05-19 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
Subjects
Disabilities: other
Law enforcement: law enforcement information network (LEIN)
State agencies (existing): state
State agencies (existing): state police
Traffic control: driver license
Vehicles: registration
Law enforcement: law enforcement information network (LEIN)
State agencies (existing): state
State agencies (existing): state police
Traffic control: driver license
Vehicles: registration