MI SB0289 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Engrossed on December 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-15 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-15 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure: records; child abuse offenders registry; create. Creates new act.
Title
Criminal procedure: records; child abuse offenders registry; create. Creates new act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 543 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-15 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2020-12-15 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-12-11 | House | Received On 12/11/2020 |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 543 Yeas 37 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-5) |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Substitute (s-5) Concurred In |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-5) |
2020-09-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-2) |
2020-09-15 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-2) |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Curtis Hertel |