MI SB0373 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-05-06 - Referred To Committee On Tax Policy
Pending: House Tax Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-05-06 - Referred To Committee On Tax Policy
Pending: House Tax Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Property tax; assessments; assessment notice; revise notice time to 30 days. Amends sec. 24c of 1893 PA 206 (MCL 211.24c).
Title
Property tax; assessments; assessment notice; revise notice time to 30 days. Amends sec. 24c of 1893 PA 206 (MCL 211.24c).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-06 | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy | |
2009-05-06 | Read A First Time | |
2009-05-06 | Received On 05/06/2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Passed Roll Call # 144 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 | |
2009-05-05 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 | |
2009-05-05 | Substitute S-1 Concurred In | |
2009-05-05 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 | |
2009-04-30 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 | |
2009-04-30 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | |
2009-04-30 | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 | |
2009-03-12 | Referred To Committee On Local, Urban And State Affairs |