MI SB0374 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-12 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-12 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Vehicles; registration plates; requirement for secretary of state to use digital printing method on registration plates; provide for. Amends sec. 224 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.224).
Title
Vehicles; registration plates; requirement for secretary of state to use digital printing method on registration plates; provide for. Amends sec. 224 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.224).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 698 (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 698 (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-12 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-12-12 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2018-12-05 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2018-12-05 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-12-05 | House | Received On 12/05/2018 |
2018-12-05 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 698 Yeas 32 Nays 5 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-12-05 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-12-05 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-12-05 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-3 |
2018-12-05 | Senate | Substitute S-3 Concurred In |
2018-12-05 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-3 |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Wayne Schmidt |