MI SB0389 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Assigned Pa 0055'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Assigned Pa 0055'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Veterans; benefits; veterans who did not graduate but joined the armed forces during Vietnam War; grant high school diploma to. Amends sec. 1 of 2001 PA 181 (MCL 35.341).
Title
Veterans; benefits; veterans who did not graduate but joined the armed forces during Vietnam War; grant high school diploma to. Amends sec. 1 of 2001 PA 181 (MCL 35.341).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-11 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 89 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 341 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 341 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0055'14 With Immediate Effect |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 3/25/2014 @ 4:32 Pm |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Approved By Governor 3/25/2014 @ 2:58 Pm |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Presented To Governor 3/19/2014 @ 2:22 Pm |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2014-03-11 | House | Returned To Senate |
2014-03-11 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 89 Yeas 110 Nays 0 |
2014-03-11 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-03-06 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-03-06 | House | Read A Second Time |
2013-11-06 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2013-11-06 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2013-09-03 | House | Referred To Committee On Military And Veterans Affairs |
2013-09-03 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-09-03 | House | Received On 09/03/2013 |
2013-09-03 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 341 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2013-08-27 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2013-08-27 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2013-08-27 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Veterans, Military Affairs And Homeland Security |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Judith Emmons |