MI SB0400 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-25 - Referred To Committee On Labor
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-25 - Referred To Committee On Labor
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Employment security; benefits; training benefits charged to nonchargeable account; clarify. Amends sec. 20 of 1936 (Ex Sess) PA 1 (MCL 421.20).
Title
Employment security; benefits; training benefits charged to nonchargeable account; clarify. Amends sec. 20 of 1936 (Ex Sess) PA 1 (MCL 421.20).
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Stamas [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-03-25 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-25 | Referred To Committee On Labor | |
2009-03-25 | Passed Roll Call # 79 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | |
2009-03-25 | Read A First Time | |
2009-03-25 | Received On 03/25/2009 | |
2009-03-25 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2009-03-25 | Rules Suspended | |
2009-03-25 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | |
2009-03-25 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | |
2009-03-25 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | |
2009-03-25 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | |
2009-03-25 | Reported Favorably Without Amendment | |
2009-03-19 | Referred To Committee On Commerce And Tourism |
Same As/Similar To
HB4669 (Same As) 2009-04-21 - Assigned Pa 20'09 With Immediate Effect