MI SB0416 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Use tax: exemptions; identifying information required for claiming exemption; include purchaser's license number issued by the Michigan liquor control commission to satisfy the requirements and add exemption for micro brewers. Amends secs. 14a & 14b of 1937 PA 94 (MCL 205.104a & 205.104b). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0415'23
Title
Use tax: exemptions; identifying information required for claiming exemption; include purchaser's license number issued by the Michigan liquor control commission to satisfy the requirements and add exemption for micro brewers. Amends secs. 14a & 14b of 1937 PA 94 (MCL 205.104a & 205.104b). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0415'23
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 5 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-11-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 5 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-11-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-06 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2024-03-06 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2024-01-30 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2024-01-30 | House | Read A First Time |
2024-01-30 | House | Received On 01/25/2024 |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 5 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2023-11-09 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2023-11-09 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance, Insurance, And Consumer Protection |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Veronica Klinefelt |
Same As/Similar To
SB0415 (Same As) 2024-03-06 - Referred To Second Reading