MI SB0449 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 25 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 25 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Human services: medical services; access to quality complex rehabilitation technology; provide for. Amends 1939 PA 280 (MCL 400.1 - 400.119b) by adding sec. 108b. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0450'23
Title
Human services: medical services; access to quality complex rehabilitation technology; provide for. Amends 1939 PA 280 (MCL 400.1 - 400.119b) by adding sec. 108b. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0450'23
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Daley [R] | Sen. Jeff Irwin [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 590 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-19 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 590 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-19 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2024-04-25 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2023-10-25 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2023-10-25 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-10-25 | House | Received On 10/25/2023 |
2023-10-25 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 590 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2023-10-24 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2023-10-24 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2023-10-19 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2023-10-19 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2023-06-28 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2023-06-28 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Kevin Daley |
Same As/Similar To
SB0450 (Same As) 2024-04-25 - Referred To Second Reading