MI SB0498 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - Referred To Committee On Families, Children And Seniors
Pending: House Families, Children, And Seniors Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - Referred To Committee On Families, Children And Seniors
Pending: House Families, Children, And Seniors Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Children: foster care; change in foster care placement; modify. Amends sec. 13b, ch. XIIA of 1939 PA 288 (MCL 712A.13b).
Title
Children: foster care; change in foster care placement; modify. Amends sec. 13b, ch. XIIA of 1939 PA 288 (MCL 712A.13b).
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Irwin [D] | Sen. Erika Geiss [D] | Sen. Mary Cavanagh [D] | Sen. Mallory McMorrow [D] |
Sen. Veronica Klinefelt [D] | Sen. Stephanie Chang [D] | Sen. John Damoose [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 36 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-28 | House | Referred To Committee On Families, Children And Seniors |
2024-02-28 | House | Read A First Time |
2024-02-28 | House | Received On 02/28/2024 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 36 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2023-09-14 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Housing And Human Services |
2023-09-14 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Jeff Irwin |