MI SB0564 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-27 - Assigned Pa 0356'12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-27 - Assigned Pa 0356'12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Human services; medical services; premiums for medicaid "freedom to work" program; modify. Amends sec. 106a of 1939 PA 280 (MCL 400.106a).
Title
Human services; medical services; premiums for medicaid "freedom to work" program; modify. Amends sec. 106a of 1939 PA 280 (MCL 400.106a).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-11-29 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 648 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 650 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 650 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-27 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0356'12 |
2012-12-27 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/13/2012 @ 1:24 Pm |
2012-12-27 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/12/2012 @ 8:12 Pm |
2012-12-12 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/11/2012 @ 4:52 Pm |
2012-12-04 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-04 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-12-04 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2012-12-04 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2012-11-29 | House | Returned To Senate |
2012-11-29 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2012-11-29 | House | Passed Roll Call # 648 Yeas 108 Nays 0 |
2012-11-29 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-11-28 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-11-28 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-11-08 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-11-08 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2012-09-20 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2012-09-20 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-09-20 | House | Received On 09/20/2012 |
2012-09-20 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 650 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-09-19 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2012-09-19 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2012-09-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2012-09-13 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-09-13 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2011-07-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |