MI SB0564 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 20-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-20 - Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice
Pending: House Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-20 - Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice
Pending: House Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Crimes; controlled substances; purchase of pseudoephedrine or ephedrine for another individual who intends to manufacture methamphetamines; establish as a crime. Amends sec. 17766c of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.17766c).
Title
Crimes; controlled substances; purchase of pseudoephedrine or ephedrine for another individual who intends to manufacture methamphetamines; establish as a crime. Amends sec. 17766c of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.17766c).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 47 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-20 | House | Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice |
2014-02-20 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-02-20 | House | Received On 02/20/2014 |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 47 Yeas 37 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2013-10-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2013-10-01 | Senate | Introduced By Senator John Proos |