MI SB0613 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-25 - Referred To Committee On Labor
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-25 - Referred To Committee On Labor
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Employment security; administration; sanctions for violators; revise. Amends sec. 54 of 1936 (Ex Sess) PA 1 (MCL 421.54). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0612'09, SB 0614'09, SB 0615'09
Title
Employment security; administration; sanctions for violators; revise. Amends sec. 54 of 1936 (Ex Sess) PA 1 (MCL 421.54). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0612'09, SB 0614'09, SB 0615'09
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-25 | Referred To Committee On Labor | |
2009-06-25 | Read A First Time | |
2009-06-25 | Received On 06/25/2009 | |
2009-06-25 | Passed Roll Call # 356 Yeas 21 Nays 15 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 | |
2009-06-25 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2009-06-25 | Rules Suspended | |
2009-06-25 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Amendment(s) | |
2009-06-25 | Amendment(s) Concurred In | |
2009-06-25 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Amendment(s) | |
2009-06-24 | Placed On Order Of General Orders | |
2009-06-24 | Discharge Committee Approved | |
2009-05-27 | Referred To Committee On Commerce And Tourism |