MI SB0627 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-01 - Referred To Committee On Commerce And Trade
Pending: House Commerce And Trade Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-01 - Referred To Committee On Commerce And Trade
Pending: House Commerce And Trade Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
State financing and management; authorities; public-private partnerships; allow for certain public authorities. Creates new act.
Title
State financing and management; authorities; public-private partnerships; allow for certain public authorities. Creates new act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 666 (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-12-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 648 (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-11-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Defeated Roll Call # 636 (Y: 18 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-10-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 648 (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-11-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Defeated Roll Call # 636 (Y: 18 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-10-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-01 | House | Referred To Committee On Commerce And Trade |
2016-12-01 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-12-01 | House | Received On 12/01/2016 |
2016-12-01 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 666 Yeas 28 Nays 8 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2016-12-01 | Senate | Vote Reconsidered |
2016-12-01 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 648 Yeas 30 Nays 6 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2016-12-01 | Senate | Amendment(s) Adopted |
2016-11-29 | Senate | Postponed For The Day |
2016-11-29 | Senate | Vote Reconsidered |
2016-11-29 | Senate | Defeated Roll Call # 636 Yeas 18 Nays 19 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2016-11-29 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2016-11-29 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2016-11-29 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2016-11-29 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2016-11-29 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2016-10-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2016-10-18 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-10-18 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2015-12-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Commerce |
2015-12-01 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Michael Kowall |
Subjects
State agencies (existing): transportation
State financing and management: authorities
Transportation: other
State financing and management: authorities
Transportation: other