MI SB0664 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-13 - Assigned Pa 0360'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-13 - Assigned Pa 0360'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Occupations; notaries public; electronic notarization of documents; clarify. Amends secs. 3, 5, 7, 15, 26b & 27 of 2003 PA 238 (MCL 55.263 et seq.) & adds secs. 26 & 26a. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0996'18, SB 0996'18, SB 0997'18, SB 0997'18, SB 0998'18, SB 0998'18
Title
Occupations; notaries public; electronic notarization of documents; clarify. Amends secs. 3, 5, 7, 15, 26b & 27 of 2003 PA 238 (MCL 55.263 et seq.) & adds secs. 26 & 26a. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0996'18, SB 0996'18, SB 0997'18, SB 0997'18, SB 0998'18, SB 0998'18
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-11-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 606 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-27 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 637 (Y: 107 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 403 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-27 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 637 (Y: 107 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 403 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-13 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0360'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/12/2018 @ 4:24 Pm |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/12/2018 @ 12:12 Pm |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/5/2018 @ 9:34 Am |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Roll Call # 606 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2018-11-28 | Senate | House Substitute H-2 Concurred In |
2018-11-27 | House | Returned To Senate |
2018-11-27 | House | Title Amended |
2018-11-27 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 637 Yeas 106 Nays 2 |
2018-11-27 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-11-27 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-11-27 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-11-27 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2018-11-27 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-09-26 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-09-26 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2018-06-06 | House | Referred To Committee On Financial Services |
2018-06-06 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-06-06 | House | Received On 06/06/2018 |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 403 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2018-06-05 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-3 |
2018-06-05 | Senate | Substitute S-3 Concurred In |
2018-06-05 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-3 |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2 |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Banking And Financial Institutions |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2017-11-28 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance |
2017-11-28 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Peter Macgregor |