MI SB0785 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-22 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-22 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Tobacco: other; penal code provisions for selling or distributing tobacco products by mail or vending machines; modify age. Amends sec. 42b of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.42b).
Title
Tobacco: other; penal code provisions for selling or distributing tobacco products by mail or vending machines; modify age. Amends sec. 42b of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.42b).
Sponsors
Rep. Dale Zorn [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 203 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-22 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2020-06-17 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2020-06-17 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-06-17 | House | Received On 06/17/2020 |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 203 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Dale W. Zorn |