MI SB0796 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-29 - Assigned Pa 0312'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-29 - Assigned Pa 0312'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Michigan business tax; credit; qualified film production credit confidentiality reporting provisions; clarify, and require a semiannual report. Amends sec. 455 of 2007 PA 36 (MCL 208.1455).
Title
Michigan business tax; credit; qualified film production credit confidentiality reporting provisions; clarify, and require a semiannual report. Amends sec. 455 of 2007 PA 36 (MCL 208.1455).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-30 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-10-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-10-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-29 | Assigned Pa 0312'10 With Immediate Effect | |
2010-12-29 | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/21/2010 @ 11:54 Am | |
2010-12-29 | Approved By Governor 12/21/2010 @ 11:02 Am | |
2010-12-15 | Presented To Governor 12/10/2010 @ 4:29 Pm | |
2010-12-02 | Ordered Enrolled | |
2010-12-02 | Full Title Agreed To | |
2010-12-02 | Given Immediate Effect | |
2010-12-02 | Roll Call # 626 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 | |
2010-12-02 | House Substitute H-2 Concurred In | |
2010-12-02 | House Inserted Full Title | |
2010-12-02 | Returned To Senate | |
2010-12-02 | Inserted Full Title | |
2010-12-02 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 526 Yeas 97 Nays 2 | |
2010-12-02 | Read A Third Time | |
2010-12-02 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2010-12-02 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2010-12-02 | Substitute H-2 Adopted | |
2010-12-02 | Substitute H-1 Not Adopted | |
2010-12-02 | Read A Second Time | |
2010-06-30 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2010-06-30 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 | |
2009-12-17 | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy | |
2009-12-17 | Read A First Time | |
2009-12-17 | Received On 12/17/2009 | |
2009-12-17 | Passed Roll Call # 722 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 | |
2009-12-17 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2009-12-17 | Rules Suspended | |
2009-12-17 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 | |
2009-12-17 | Substitute S-2 Concurred In | |
2009-12-17 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 | |
2009-10-13 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 | |
2009-10-13 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | |
2009-10-13 | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 | |
2009-09-09 | Referred To Committee On Finance |