MI SB0826 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-17 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy
Pending: House Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-17 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy
Pending: House Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Health occupations; physicians; licensure of naturopathic physicians; provide for. Amends secs. 16265 & 17708 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.16265 & 333.17708) & adds sec. 16348a & pt. 186.
Title
Health occupations; physicians; licensure of naturopathic physicians; provide for. Amends secs. 16265 & 17708 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.16265 & 333.17708) & adds sec. 16348a & pt. 186.
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 305 (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-17 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2018-05-17 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-05-17 | House | Received On 05/17/2018 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 305 Yeas 24 Nays 11 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Rick Jones |
Subjects
Health occupations: physicians
Occupations: individual licensing and regulation
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs
Occupations: individual licensing and regulation
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs