MI SB0853 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-30 - Assigned Pa 0389'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-30 - Assigned Pa 0389'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Environmental protection; pollution prevention; ordinances regulating plastic bags and other containers; preempt. Creates new act.
Title
Environmental protection; pollution prevention; ordinances regulating plastic bags and other containers; preempt. Creates new act.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Stamas [R] | Sen. Kenneth Horn [R] | Sen. John Brandenburg [R] | Sen. Michael Shirkey [R] |
Sen. Wayne Schmidt [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-12-01 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 535 (Y: 62 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-20 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 255 (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-20 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 255 (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-30 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0389'16 With Immediate Effect |
2016-12-30 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/28/2016 @ 1:38 Pm |
2016-12-30 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/28/2016 @ 10:17 Am 12/30/16 Addenda |
2016-12-28 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/28/2016 @ 9:19 Am |
2016-12-08 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-12-08 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2016-12-01 | House | Returned To Senate |
2016-12-01 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 535 Yeas 62 Nays 46 |
2016-12-01 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-11-30 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-11-30 | House | Read A Second Time |
2016-09-20 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-09-20 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2016-05-10 | House | Referred To Committee On Commerce And Trade |
2016-05-10 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-05-10 | House | Received On 05/10/2016 |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 255 Yeas 25 Nays 12 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Amendment(s) Defeated |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Postponed For The Day |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Read A Third Time |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Commerce |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Jim Stamas |
Subjects
Cities: ordinances
Counties: ordinances
Environmental protection: pollution prevention
Environmental protection: recycling
Townships: ordinances
Villages: ordinances
Counties: ordinances
Environmental protection: pollution prevention
Environmental protection: recycling
Townships: ordinances
Villages: ordinances