MI SB0910 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-30 - Assigned Pa 0473'16 12/30/16 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-30 - Assigned Pa 0473'16 12/30/16 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Environmental protection; funding; clean Michigan initiative bond fund; modify criteria for grants and loans. Amends secs. 19601, 19607, 19608 & 19608a of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.19601 et seq.) & adds sec. 19608b.
Title
Environmental protection; funding; clean Michigan initiative bond fund; modify criteria for grants and loans. Amends secs. 19601, 19607, 19608 & 19608a of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.19601 et seq.) & adds sec. 19608b.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-14 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 702 (Y: 106 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 537 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 537 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-30 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0473'16 12/30/16 Addenda |
2016-12-30 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/5/2017 @ 2:58 Pm 12/30/16 Addenda |
2016-12-30 | Senate | Approved By Governor 1/4/2017 @ 12:24 Pm 12/30/16 Addenda |
2016-12-30 | Senate | Presented To Governor 1/3/2017 @ 12:30 Pm 12/30/16 Addenda |
2016-12-15 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-12-15 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2016-12-15 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2016-12-14 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2016-12-14 | House | Returned To Senate |
2016-12-14 | House | Passed Roll Call # 702 Yeas 106 Nays 2 |
2016-12-14 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-12-14 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2016-12-14 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-12-14 | House | Read A Second Time |
2016-12-06 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-12-06 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2016-10-19 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources |
2016-10-19 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-10-19 | House | Received On 10/18/2016 |
2016-10-18 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 537 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2016-09-08 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2016-09-08 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2016-09-08 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Commerce |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Margaret O'brien |
Subjects
Economic development: brownfield redevelopment authority
Environmental protection: cleanups
Environmental protection: funding
Natural resources: funding
State agencies (existing): environmental quality
State agencies (existing): natural resources
Environmental protection: cleanups
Environmental protection: funding
Natural resources: funding
State agencies (existing): environmental quality
State agencies (existing): natural resources