MI SB0934 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on December 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-27 - Assigned Pa 0372'12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on December 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-27 - Assigned Pa 0372'12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Crimes; criminal sexual conduct; sexual penetration or contact of a foster child regardless of age by certain care providers; prohibit during residency. Amends secs. 520b, 520c, 520d & 520e of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.520b et seq.).
Title
Crimes; criminal sexual conduct; sexual penetration or contact of a foster child regardless of age by certain care providers; prohibit during residency. Amends secs. 520b, 520c, 520d & 520e of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.520b et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: House Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 817 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 646 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Amendment(s) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 146 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 646 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Amendment(s) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 146 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-27 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0372'12 |
2012-12-27 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/14/2012 @ 4:36 Pm |
2012-12-27 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/14/2012 @ 9:46 Am |
2012-12-14 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/13/2012 @ 1:49 Pm |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2012-12-05 | Senate | House Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 817 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-12-04 | Senate | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2012-12-04 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2012-11-29 | House | Returned To Senate |
2012-11-29 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2012-11-29 | House | Passed Roll Call # 646 Yeas 108 Nays 0 |
2012-11-29 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-11-28 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-11-28 | House | Amended |
2012-11-28 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-11-08 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-11-08 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Amendment(s) |
2012-03-20 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2012-03-20 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-03-20 | House | Received On 03/20/2012 |
2012-03-20 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 146 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-03-15 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2012-03-15 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2012-03-15 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-02-22 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2012-02-22 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-02-22 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-02-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
HB5528 (Same As) 2012-04-17 - Printed Bill Filed 03/29/2012