MI SB0965 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - Assigned Pa 0419'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - Assigned Pa 0419'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Natural resources; soil and erosion; administration and enforcement of part 91 of NREPA; expressly allow municipalities to act jointly. Amends sec. 9106 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.9106).
Title
Natural resources; soil and erosion; administration and enforcement of part 91 of NREPA; expressly allow municipalities to act jointly. Amends sec. 9106 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.9106).
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Hune [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 795 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 515 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 515 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-21 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0419'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/20/2018 @ 1:16 Pm |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/19/2018 @ 9:01 Pm |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/17/2018 @ 4:26 Pm |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-12-12 | House | Returned To Senate |
2018-12-12 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2018-12-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 795 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2018-12-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-12-11 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-12-11 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-11-28 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-11-28 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-06-12 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources |
2018-06-12 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-06-12 | House | Received On 06/12/2018 |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 515 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Joe Hune |
Subjects
Cities: other
Counties: other
Natural resources: soil and erosion
State agencies (existing): environmental quality
Townships: other
Villages: other
Counties: other
Natural resources: soil and erosion
State agencies (existing): environmental quality
Townships: other
Villages: other