MI SB0970 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-27 - Assigned Pa 0394'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-27 - Assigned Pa 0394'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Income tax; city; rollback and maximum tax rate for residents and nonresidents within certain cities; eliminate rollback and reduce rate under certain circumstances. Amends sec. 3, ch. 1 of 1964 PA 284 (MCL 141.503). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5688'12, HB 5705'12
Title
Income tax; city; rollback and maximum tax rate for residents and nonresidents within certain cities; eliminate rollback and reduce rate under certain circumstances. Amends sec. 3, ch. 1 of 1964 PA 284 (MCL 141.503). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5688'12, HB 5705'12
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 820 (Y: 59 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 799 (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 799 (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-27 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0394'12 With Immediate Effect |
2012-12-27 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/19/2012 @ 5:44 Pm |
2012-12-27 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/19/2012 @ 12:54 Pm |
2012-12-27 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/19/2012 @ 12:06 Pm |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2012-12-13 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-13 | House | Returned To Senate |
2012-12-13 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-13 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 820 Yeas 59 Nays 50 |
2012-12-13 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-12-13 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-12-13 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-12-13 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-12-13 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-12-13 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2012-12-12 | House | Notice Given To Discharge Committee |
2012-12-11 | House | Notice Given To Discharge Committee |
2012-12-04 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2012-12-04 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-12-04 | House | Received On 12/04/2012 |
2012-12-04 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2012-12-04 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 799 Yeas 20 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-12-04 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-12-04 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2012-12-04 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-5 |
2012-12-04 | Senate | Substitute S-5 Concurred In |
2012-12-04 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-5 |
2012-12-04 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2012-12-04 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2012-09-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2012-06-14 | Senate | Postponed For The Day |
2012-06-14 | Senate | Amendment(s) Offered |
2012-06-14 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-06-14 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2012-06-14 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2012-06-14 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2012-06-14 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-06-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2012-06-13 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-06-13 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-06-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2012-06-12 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2012-06-12 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2012-02-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance |