MI SB0970 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-30 - Assigned Pa 0326'20
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-30 - Assigned Pa 0326'20
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Taxation: tobacco; out-of-state vendor; require to remit tax. Amends secs. 2 & 11 of 1993 PA 327 (MCL 205.422 & 205.431).
Title
Taxation: tobacco; out-of-state vendor; require to remit tax. Amends secs. 2 & 11 of 1993 PA 327 (MCL 205.422 & 205.431).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: House Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 628 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 636 (Y: 68 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 384 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 636 (Y: 68 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 384 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-30 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0326'20 |
2020-12-30 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/29/2020 03:04 Pm |
2020-12-30 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/29/2020 11:16 Am |
2020-12-23 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/22/2020 12:12 Pm |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2020-12-18 | Senate | House Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 628 Yeas 36 Nays 1 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2020-12-17 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2020-12-17 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 636 Yeas 68 Nays 33 Excused 0 Not Voting 9 |
2020-12-17 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-12-17 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-12-17 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-12-17 | House | Amended |
2020-12-17 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-12-17 | House | Placed On Second Reading |
2020-12-17 | House | Motion To Discharge Committee Approved |
2020-12-17 | House | Rule Suspended |
2020-09-30 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2020-09-30 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-09-30 | House | Received On 09/30/2020 |
2020-09-30 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 384 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-09-24 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-2) |
2020-09-24 | Senate | Substitute (s-2) Concurred In |
2020-09-24 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-2) |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Jim Runestad |