MI SB0982 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-30 - Assigned Pa 0552'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-30 - Assigned Pa 0552'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Law; uniform or model acts; uniform fraudulent transfer act; update to uniform voidable transactions act. Amends title & secs. 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, 7, 8, 9, 10, 11, 12 & 13 of 1998 PA 434 (MCL 566.31 et seq.) & adds secs. 14 & 15.
Title
Law; uniform or model acts; uniform fraudulent transfer act; update to uniform voidable transactions act. Amends title & secs. 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, 7, 8, 9, 10, 11, 12 & 13 of 1998 PA 434 (MCL 566.31 et seq.) & adds secs. 14 & 15.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 838 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-12-15 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 726 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 560 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-15 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 726 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 560 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-30 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0552'16 With Immediate Effect |
2016-12-30 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/10/2017 @ 11:44 Am |
2016-12-30 | Senate | Approved By Governor 1/6/2017 @ 9:20 Am |
2016-12-30 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/28/2016 @ 3:06 Pm 12/30/16 Addenda |
2016-12-15 | House | Title Amended |
2016-12-15 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-12-15 | Senate | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2016-12-15 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2016-12-15 | Senate | Roll Call # 838 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2016-12-15 | Senate | House Substitute H-2 Concurred In |
2016-12-15 | House | Returned To Senate |
2016-12-15 | House | Passed Roll Call # 726 Yeas 107 Nays 1 |
2016-12-15 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-12-15 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2016-12-15 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-12-15 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2016-12-15 | House | Substitute H-1 Not Adopted |
2016-12-15 | House | Read A Second Time |
2016-12-06 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-12-06 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2016-11-09 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2016-11-09 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-11-09 | House | Received On 10/20/2016 |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 560 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2016-10-19 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2016-10-19 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2016-10-19 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2016-09-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2016-09-08 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-09-08 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Tonya Schuitmaker |
Subjects
Civil procedure: bankruptcy
Civil procedure: remedies
Consumer protection: other
Law: uniform or model acts
Liens: other
Probate: other
Property: other
Property: personal
Trade: business regulation
Civil procedure: remedies
Consumer protection: other
Law: uniform or model acts
Liens: other
Probate: other
Property: other
Property: personal
Trade: business regulation