MI SB0995 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - Assigned Pa 0269'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - Assigned Pa 0269'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health facilities; emergency medical services; amount of liability coverage required for certain hospital aircraft transport vehicles; modify. Amends sec. 20934 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.20934).
Title
Health facilities; emergency medical services; amount of liability coverage required for certain hospital aircraft transport vehicles; modify. Amends sec. 20934 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.20934).
Sponsors
Sen. Howard Walker [R] | Sen. Thomas Casperson [R] | Sen. Goeff Hansen [R] | Sen. Patrick Colbeck [R] |
Sen. Darwin Booher [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-06-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 459 (Y: 109 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 468 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 468 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-18 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0269'12 With Immediate Effect |
2012-07-18 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 7/3/2012 @ 10:12 Am |
2012-07-18 | Senate | Approved By Governor 6/25/2012 @ 3:52 Pm |
2012-07-18 | Senate | Presented To Governor 6/21/2012 @ 10:58 Am |
2012-06-14 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2012-06-14 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-06-14 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2012-06-14 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2012-06-14 | House | Returned To Senate |
2012-06-14 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2012-06-14 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 459 Yeas 109 Nays 1 |
2012-06-14 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-06-13 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-06-13 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-06-12 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-06-12 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2012-06-07 | House | Referred To Committee On Insurance |
2012-06-07 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-06-07 | House | Received On 06/07/2012 |
2012-06-07 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 468 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2012-06-07 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-06-07 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2012-06-07 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2012-06-07 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2012-06-07 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-06-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2012-06-06 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-06-06 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Insurance |