MI SB1056 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Vetoed By Governor 12/30/2014 2014 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Vetoed By Governor 12/30/2014 2014 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Property; conveyances; certain land in Calhoun county; provide for conveyance after obtaining from United States. Amends 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.101 - 324.90106) by adding sec. 2120a. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0052'13
Title
Property; conveyances; certain land in Calhoun county; provide for conveyance after obtaining from United States. Amends 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.101 - 324.90106) by adding sec. 2120a. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0052'13
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Nofs [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-12-11 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 670 (Y: 104 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-03 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 666 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-10-02 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-03 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 666 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-10-02 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-31 | Senate | Vetoed By Governor 12/30/2014 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-19 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/18/2014 @ 12:34 Pm |
2014-12-15 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2014-12-15 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2014-12-15 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2014-12-11 | House | Returned To Senate |
2014-12-11 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2014-12-11 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 670 Yeas 104 Nays 2 |
2014-12-11 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-12-10 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-12-10 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-12-03 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-12-03 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2014-11-13 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2014-11-13 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-11-13 | House | Received On 11/13/2014 |
2014-11-13 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 666 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2014-11-12 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2014-11-12 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2014-11-12 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2014-10-02 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2014-10-02 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-10-02 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2014-09-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Local Government And Elections |
2014-09-11 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Mike Nofs |
Subjects
Property, conveyances
State agencies (existing), attorney general
State agencies (existing), natural resources
State agencies (existing), attorney general
State agencies (existing), natural resources