MI SB1056 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-01 - Referred To Committee On Financial Services
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-01 - Referred To Committee On Financial Services
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Financial institutions; money transmitters; parity for depository financial institutions under the money transmission services act; establish. Amends sec. 4 of 2006 PA 250 (MCL 487.1004).
Title
Financial institutions; money transmitters; parity for depository financial institutions under the money transmission services act; establish. Amends sec. 4 of 2006 PA 250 (MCL 487.1004).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 661 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-11-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-01 | House | Referred To Committee On Financial Services |
2016-12-01 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-12-01 | House | Received On 12/01/2016 |
2016-12-01 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 661 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2016-11-30 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 As Amended |
2016-11-30 | Senate | Substitute S-1 As Amended Concurred In |
2016-11-30 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 And Amendment(s) |
2016-11-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2016-11-30 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-11-30 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2016-09-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Banking And Financial Institutions |
2016-09-07 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Margaret O'brien |