MI SB1098 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-10 - Referred To Committee On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-10 - Referred To Committee On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Mental health; code; priority populations for services; expand to include certain individuals. Amends sec. 208 of 1974 PA 258 (MCL 330.1208).
Title
Mental health; code; priority populations for services; expand to include certain individuals. Amends sec. 208 of 1974 PA 258 (MCL 330.1208).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 753 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-12-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-10 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2014-12-10 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-12-10 | House | Received On 12/10/2014 |
2014-12-10 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 753 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2014-12-10 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2014-12-10 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2014-12-10 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2014-12-10 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2014-12-10 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2014-12-09 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2014-12-09 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-12-09 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2014-09-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors And Human Services |
2014-09-30 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Bruce Caswell |