MI SB1110 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on September 22 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-09-22 - Referred To Committee On Ethics And Elections
Pending: House Ethics And Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 22 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-09-22 - Referred To Committee On Ethics And Elections
Pending: House Ethics And Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; other; option to elect county road commissioners by geographic districts of equal population; provide for in the Michigan election law. Amends secs. 252, 254, 267 & 269 of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.252 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: SB 1108'10, SB 1109'10, SB 1476'10, SB 1477'10, SB 1478'10
Title
Elections; other; option to elect county road commissioners by geographic districts of equal population; provide for in the Michigan election law. Amends secs. 252, 254, 267 & 269 of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.252 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: SB 1108'10, SB 1109'10, SB 1476'10, SB 1477'10, SB 1478'10
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-22 | Referred To Committee On Ethics And Elections | |
2010-09-22 | Read A First Time | |
2010-09-22 | Received On 09/22/2010 | |
2010-09-22 | Passed Roll Call # 433 Yeas 26 Nays 11 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 | |
2010-09-21 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 | |
2010-09-21 | Substitute S-1 Concurred In | |
2010-09-21 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 | |
2010-09-16 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 | |
2010-09-16 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | |
2010-09-16 | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 | |
2010-02-04 | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
HB5775 (Same As) 2010-02-03 - Printed Bill Filed 02/03/2010