MI SB1120 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-29 - Vetoed By Governor 12/21/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-29 - Vetoed By Governor 12/21/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Children; parental rights; provision relating to parent who voluntarily surrendered a child to an emergency service provider; eliminate. Amends sec. 19b, ch. XIIA of 1939 PA 288 (MCL 712A.19b).
Title
Children; parental rights; provision relating to parent who voluntarily surrendered a child to an emergency service provider; eliminate. Amends sec. 19b, ch. XIIA of 1939 PA 288 (MCL 712A.19b).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-25 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-29 | Vetoed By Governor 12/21/2010 | |
2010-12-15 | Presented To Governor 12/10/2010 @ 4:39 Pm | |
2010-12-03 | Ordered Enrolled | |
2010-12-03 | Full Title Agreed To | |
2010-12-03 | Given Immediate Effect | |
2010-12-03 | House Inserted Full Title | |
2010-12-02 | Returned To Senate | |
2010-12-02 | Inserted Full Title | |
2010-12-02 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 558 Yeas 100 Nays 0 | |
2010-12-02 | Read A Third Time | |
2010-12-02 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2010-12-02 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2010-12-02 | Read A Second Time | |
2010-12-02 | Placed On Second Reading | |
2010-12-02 | Motion To Discharge Committee Approved | |
2010-12-01 | Notice Given To Discharge Committee | |
2010-03-04 | Referred To Committee On Families And Children's Services | |
2010-03-04 | Read A First Time | |
2010-03-04 | Received On 03/04/2010 | |
2010-03-04 | Passed Roll Call # 90 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 | |
2010-03-03 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | |
2010-03-03 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | |
2010-02-25 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | |
2010-02-25 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | |
2010-02-25 | Reported Favorably Without Amendment | |
2010-02-09 | Referred To Committee On Families And Human Services |