MI SB1219 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-15 - Referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-15 - Referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Weapons: concealed; concealed pistol licenses; require to be processed during a declared emergency. Amends secs. 5b and 5l of 1927 PA 372 (MCL 28.425b & 28.425l).
Title
Weapons: concealed; concealed pistol licenses; require to be processed during a declared emergency. Amends secs. 5b and 5l of 1927 PA 372 (MCL 28.425b & 28.425l).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 542 (Y: 22 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-03 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-03 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-15 | House | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2020-12-15 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-12-11 | House | Received On 12/11/2020 |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 542 Yeas 22 Nays 16 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2020-12-03 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2020-11-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2020-11-12 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Lana Theis |