MI SB1254 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on December 18 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-30 - Pocket Veto 01/04/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on December 18 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-30 - Pocket Veto 01/04/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure: expunction; eligibility for record expungement of certain first time operating while intoxicated convictions; allow. Amends sec. 1c of 1965 PA 213 (MCL 780.621c).
Title
Criminal procedure: expunction; eligibility for record expungement of certain first time operating while intoxicated convictions; allow. Amends sec. 1c of 1965 PA 213 (MCL 780.621c).
Sponsors
Sen. Ed McBroom [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call: Roll Call # 629 (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 615 (Y: 96 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-16 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 556 (Y: 98 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 491 (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-12-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 615 (Y: 96 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-16 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 556 (Y: 98 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 491 (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-12-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-30 | Senate | Pocket Veto 01/04/2021 |
2020-12-23 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/21/2020 01:54 Pm |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Roll Call: Roll Call # 629 Yeas 32 Nays 5 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2020-12-18 | Senate | House Substitute (h-1) Concurred In |
2020-12-17 | House | Returned To Senate |
2020-12-17 | House | Passed Roll Call # 615 Yeas 96 Nays 8 Excused 0 Not Voting 6 |
2020-12-17 | House | Amended |
2020-12-17 | House | Vote On Passage Reconsidered |
2020-12-17 | House | Returned As Requested |
2020-12-17 | House | House Requests Return |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2020-12-16 | House | Returned To Senate |
2020-12-16 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2020-12-16 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 556 Yeas 98 Nays 8 Excused 0 Not Voting 4 |
2020-12-16 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-12-16 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-12-16 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-12-16 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted And Amended |
2020-12-16 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-12-15 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-12-15 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2020-12-10 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2020-12-10 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-12-10 | House | Received On 12/10/2020 |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 491 Yeas 29 Nays 7 Excused 1 Not Voting 1 |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-12-03 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety |
2020-12-03 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Ed Mcbroom |
Subjects
Criminal procedure: expunction
Criminal procedure: records
Records: other
State agencies (existing): corrections
Criminal procedure: records
Records: other
State agencies (existing): corrections