MI SB1419 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 10 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-12-01 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 10 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-12-01 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Economic development; other; regional convention and tourism promotion act; create. Creates new act.
Title
Economic development; other; regional convention and tourism promotion act; create. Creates new act.
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Stamas [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-12-01 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-11-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-11-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-01 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2010-12-01 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | |
2010-11-10 | Referred To Committee On New Economy And Quality Of Life | |
2010-11-10 | Read A First Time | |
2010-11-10 | Received On 11/10/2010 | |
2010-11-10 | Passed Roll Call # 523 Yeas 33 Nays 5 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | |
2010-11-10 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2010-11-10 | Rules Suspended | |
2010-11-10 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 As Amended | |
2010-11-10 | Substitute S-1 As Amended Concurred In | |
2010-11-10 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 And Amendment(s) | |
2010-11-09 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 | |
2010-11-09 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | |
2010-11-09 | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 | |
2010-07-21 | Referred To Committee On Commerce And Tourism |
Same As/Similar To
HB6206 (Same As) 2010-12-15 - Assigned Pa 254'10 With Immediate Effect