MN HF10 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-8)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-12 - Author added Erickson.
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-12 - Author added Erickson.
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Veteran jobs tax credit provided.
Title
Veteran jobs tax credit provided.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-12 | House | Author added Erickson. |
2015-02-05 | House | Author added Atkins |
2015-01-29 | House | Author added Fischer. |
2015-01-29 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Taxes |
2015-01-26 | House | Authors added Masin and Newton. |
2015-01-22 | House | Author added Howe. |
2015-01-14 | House | Author added Rosenthal |
2015-01-12 | House | Author added O'Driscoll |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Veterans Affairs Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF79 (Similar To) 2015-05-11 - Author added Hawj