MN HF132 | 2020 | 91st Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-19 - Referred to Rules and Administration
Pending: Senate Rules and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-19 - Referred to Rules and Administration
Pending: Senate Rules and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Protests and civil unrest of May and June 2020; PROMISE Act established, community repair panel created, data classified, redevelopment and relief programs created, Metropolitan Area Redevelopment Corporation established, sales and use tax imposed, insurance claims assistance required, leases regulated, eminent domain limited use authorized, sales and use tax items exempted, property tax abatement required, and money appropriated.
Title
Protests and civil unrest of May and June 2020; PROMISE Act established, community repair panel created, data classified, redevelopment and relief programs created, Metropolitan Area Redevelopment Corporation established, sales and use tax imposed, insurance claims assistance required, leases regulated, eminent domain limited use authorized, sales and use tax items exempted, property tax abatement required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Mohamud Noor [D] | Rep. Ryan Winkler [D] | Rep. Aisha Gomez [D] | Rep. Jim Davnie [D] |
Rep. Hodan Hassan [D] | Rep. Raymond Dehn [D] | Rep. Rena Moran [D] | Rep. Fue Lee [D] |
Rep. Kaohly Her [D] | Rep. Jay Xiong [D] | Rep. Tim Mahoney [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-19 - House - House: CALENDAR FOR THE DAY (Y: 74 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-19 - House - House: 68 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 61 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-19 - House - House: 68 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 61 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-19 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Received from House |
2020-06-19 | House | Bill was passed as amended |
2020-06-19 | House | Third reading as amended |
2020-06-19 | House | Amended |
2020-06-19 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Friday, June 19, 2020 |
2020-06-18 | House | Second reading |
2020-06-18 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2020-06-16 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |