MN HF1402 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-31 - Author added Bierman
Pending: House Housing Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-31 - Author added Bierman
Pending: House Housing Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Housing Finance Agency local housing trust fund grant funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Housing Finance Agency local housing trust fund grant funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Howard [D] | Rep. Barb Haley [R] | Rep. Jeff Brand [D] | Rep. Tama Theis [R] |
Rep. Duane Sauke [D] | Rep. Kaohly Her [D] | Rep. Heather Edelson [D] | Rep. Tony Jurgens [R] |
Rep. Alice Hausman [D] | Rep. Jay Xiong [D] | Rep. John Huot [D] | Rep. Robert Bierman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-31 | House | Author added Bierman |
2019-03-18 | House | Author added Huot |
2019-02-21 | House | Author added Xiong, J. |
2019-02-18 | House | Referred by Chair to Housing Finance and Policy Division |
2019-02-18 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF1961 (Similar To) 2019-03-04 - Referred to Agriculture, Rural Development, and Housing Finance