MN HF1446 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-26 - Authors added Bernardy and Fischer
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-26 - Authors added Bernardy and Fischer
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
St. Paul; River Learning Center funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Title
St. Paul; River Learning Center funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-26 | House | Authors added Bernardy and Fischer |
2019-03-15 | House | Referred by Chair to Capital Investment Division |
2019-03-12 | House | Returned by Chair to Ways and Means |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred by Chair to Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division |
2019-02-21 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF1626 (Similar To) 2019-02-25 - Referred to Capital Investment