MN HF1508 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-21 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-21 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Resident case mix classification changed.
Title
Resident case mix classification changed.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-21 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2011-05-21 | House | Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2011-05-20 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF1286 |
2011-04-28 | House | Second reading |
2011-04-28 | House | Committee report, to pass |
2011-04-18 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform |
Minnesota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=House&f=HF1508&ssn=0&y=2011 |
Text | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/bin/getbill.php?number=HF1508&version=0&session=ls87 |