MN HF1513 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-30 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-30 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Local government; city charter commission expenses payment provided.
Title
Local government; city charter commission expenses payment provided.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-30 | House | Second reading |
2020-04-30 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2020-02-20 | House | Referred by Chair to Government Operations |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred by Chair to Subcommittee on Local Government |
2019-02-21 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SF1552 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Second reading