MN HF1697 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - Referred by Chair to Capital Investment Division
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - Referred by Chair to Capital Investment Division
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Anoka County; East River Road interchange at Trunk Highway 610 improvement funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Title
Anoka County; East River Road interchange at Trunk Highway 610 improvement funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | House | Referred by Chair to Capital Investment Division |
2019-04-04 | House | Returned by Chair to Ways and Means |
2019-03-04 | House | Author added Bernardy |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred by Chair to Transportation Finance and Policy Division |
2019-02-25 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF1795 (Similar To) 2019-02-27 - Referred to Capital Investment