MN HF174 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Author added Lee, K.
Pending: House Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Author added Lee, K.
Pending: House Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Commissioner of education required to develop a model program for sexual health education, and report required.
Title
Commissioner of education required to develop a model program for sexual health education, and report required.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | House | Author added Lee, K. |
2023-03-20 | House | Author added Hemmingsen-Jaeger |
2023-03-16 | House | Author added Fischer |
2023-01-17 | House | Authors added Moller and Smith |
2023-01-11 | House | Authors added Sencer-Mura, Becker-Finn, Kotyza-Witthuhn, and Agbaje |
2023-01-09 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF662 (Similar To) 2023-01-30 - Author added Pappas