MN HF1752 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-11 - Secretary of State Chapter 293
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-11 - Secretary of State Chapter 293
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Omnibus bonding bill - 2012.
Title
Omnibus bonding bill - 2012.
Sponsors
Rep. Larry Howes [R] | Rep. Alice Hausman [D] | Rep. Morrie Lanning [R] | Sen. Bev Scalze [D] |
Rep. Gregory Davids [R] | Rep. Phyllis Kahn [D] | Sen. David Senjem [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-08 - House - Repassage, as amended by the Senate (Y: 97 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-07 - House - Passage, as amended (Y: 99 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-07 - House - Amendment (Y: 37 N: 92 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-05-07 - House - Amendment (Y: 47 N: 84 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-05-07 - House - Amendment (Y: 62 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-05-07 - House - Holberg motion - Suspension of Rule 4.05 (Y: 102 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-07 - House - Passage, as amended (Y: 99 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-07 - House - Amendment (Y: 37 N: 92 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-05-07 - House - Amendment (Y: 47 N: 84 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-05-07 - House - Amendment (Y: 62 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-05-07 - House - Holberg motion - Suspension of Rule 4.05 (Y: 102 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-11 | Secretary of State Chapter 293 | |
2012-05-11 | Governor's action Approval | |
2012-05-09 | Presented to Governor | |
2012-05-08 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by the Senate vote: 97-33 |
2012-05-08 | House | Third reading as amended by the Senate |
2012-05-08 | House | Motion prevailed |
2012-05-08 | House | Motion to concur with Senate amendments |
2012-05-08 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2012-05-08 | Senate | House concurred and repassed bill |
2012-05-07 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 45-22 |
2012-05-07 | Senate | Amended |
2012-05-07 | Senate | Second reading |
2012-05-07 | Senate | Urgency declared rules suspended |
2012-05-07 | Senate | Taken from table |
2012-05-07 | Senate | Laid on table |
2012-05-07 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2012-05-07 | Senate | Received from House |
2012-05-07 | House | Bill was passed as amended vote: 99-32 |
2012-05-07 | House | Third reading as amended |
2012-05-07 | House | Amended |
2012-05-07 | House | Motion prevailed vote: 102-29 |
2012-05-07 | House | Motion to suspend rules |
2012-05-07 | House | Reported to the House |
2012-05-03 | House | House rule 1.22, notice of intent to place on Fiscal Calendar Monday, May 7, 2012 |
2012-05-03 | House | House rule 1.22, notice of intent to place on Fiscal Calendar Thursday, May 3, 2012 |
2012-04-30 | House | House rule 1.22, notice of intent to place on Fiscal Calendar Monday, April 30, 2012 |
2012-04-27 | House | House rule 1.22, notice of intent to place on Fiscal Calendar Saturday, April 28, 2012 |
2012-04-26 | House | House rule 1.22, notice of intent to place on Fiscal Calendar Friday, April 27, 2012 |
2012-04-25 | House | House rule 1.22, notice of intent to place on Fiscal Calendar Thursday, April 26, 2012 |
2012-04-24 | House | House rule 1.22, notice of intent to place on Fiscal Calendar Wednesday, April 25, 2012 |
2012-04-23 | House | House rule 1.22, notice of intent to place on Fiscal Calendar Tuesday, April 24, 2012 |
2012-04-23 | House | Second reading |
2012-04-23 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended |
2012-03-22 | House | Committee report, to pass and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2012-02-27 | House | Authors added Davids and Kahn |
2011-05-21 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Capital Investment |