MN HF1812 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - Author added Backer
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - Author added Backer
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Minnesota Amateur Sports Commission Mighty Ducks grant funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Title
Minnesota Amateur Sports Commission Mighty Ducks grant funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | House | Author added Backer |
2019-03-15 | House | Referred by Chair to Capital Investment Division |
2019-03-13 | House | Division action, return to Ways and Means |
2019-03-04 | House | Author added Ecklund |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred by Chair to State Government Finance Division |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF2151 (Similar To) 2019-03-27 - Author added Bigham