MN HF1813 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-24 - Secretary of State Chapter 220 04/23/12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-24 - Secretary of State Chapter 220 04/23/12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Eligible contractor list required to be made available under a master contract program.
Title
Eligible contractor list required to be made available under a master contract program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-19 - House - Repassage, as amended by the Senate (Y: 87 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - House - Passage (Y: 81 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - House - Passage (Y: 81 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-24 | Secretary of State Chapter 220 04/23/12 | |
2012-04-23 | Governor's action Approval | |
2012-04-20 | Presented to Governor | |
2012-04-19 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by the Senate vote: 87-43 |
2012-04-19 | House | Third reading as amended by the Senate |
2012-04-19 | House | Motion prevailed |
2012-04-19 | House | Motion to concur with Senate amendments |
2012-04-19 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2012-04-19 | Senate | House concurred and repassed bill |
2012-04-17 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 45-19 |
2012-04-17 | Senate | Special Order |
2012-03-30 | Senate | Second reading |
2012-03-30 | Senate | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF1650 |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Received from House |
2012-03-28 | House | Bill was passed vote: 81-50 |
2012-03-28 | House | Third reading |
2012-03-26 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day |
2012-03-14 | House | Second reading |
2012-03-14 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended |
2012-02-29 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed State Government Finance |
2012-02-29 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2012-02-22 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to State Government Finance |
2012-02-08 | House | Author added Scott |
2012-01-24 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations and Elections |