MN HF1816 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-20 - Secretary of State Chapter 194 04/18/12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-20 - Secretary of State Chapter 194 04/18/12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Federally licensed firearm importers, manufacturers, and dealers authorized to possess and sell firearm silencers to government agencies, the military, and other licensed firearms importers, manufacturers, and dealers.
Title
Federally licensed firearm importers, manufacturers, and dealers authorized to possess and sell firearm silencers to government agencies, the military, and other licensed firearms importers, manufacturers, and dealers.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Benson [R] | Sen. Mary Kiffmeyer [R] | Rep. Bruce Vogel [R] | Rep. Tony Cornish [R] |
Rep. Duane Quam [R] | Rep. Peggy Scott [R] | Sen. Steve Drazkowski [R] | Sen. William Ingebrigtsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-16 - House - Repassage, as amended by Conference Committee (Y: 83 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - House - Passage (Y: 91 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - House - Passage (Y: 91 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-20 | Secretary of State Chapter 194 04/18/12 | |
2012-04-18 | Governor's action Approval | |
2012-04-17 | House | Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed vote: 58-5 |
2012-04-16 | Senate | Third reading vote: 58-5 |
2012-04-16 | Senate | Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill |
2012-04-16 | Senate | Conference committee report |
2012-04-16 | Senate | House adopted HCC report and repassed bill |
2012-04-16 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by Conference vote: 83-41 |
2012-04-16 | House | Third reading as amended by Conference |
2012-04-16 | House | House adopted conference committee report |
2012-04-16 | House | Conference committee report |
2012-04-05 | House | Senate conferees Ingebrigtsen, Harrington, Nelson |
2012-04-05 | House | Senate accedes, conference committee of 3 be appointed |
2012-04-04 | Senate | Senate conferees Ingebrigtsen; Harrington; Nelson |
2012-04-04 | Senate | Senate accedes, CC of 3 be appointed |
2012-04-04 | Senate | House conferees Benson, M.; Scott; Dittrich |
2012-04-04 | Senate | House not concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2012-04-03 | House | House conferees Benson, M.; Scott; Dittrich |
2012-04-03 | House | House refuses to concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2012-04-03 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2012-04-02 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 63-0 |
2012-04-02 | Senate | Special Order |
2012-03-30 | Senate | Second reading |
2012-03-30 | Senate | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF2125 |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Received from House |
2012-03-28 | House | Bill was passed vote: 91-40 |
2012-03-28 | House | Third reading |
2012-03-26 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day |
2012-03-07 | House | Second reading |
2012-03-07 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended |
2012-02-29 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Public Safety and Crime Prevention Policy and Finance |
2012-02-13 | House | Second reading |
2012-02-13 | House | Committee report, to pass |
2012-01-26 | House | Author added Drazkowski |
2012-01-24 | House | Author added Scott |
2012-01-24 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Crime Prevention Policy and Finance |