MN HF1826 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-25 - Third reading Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-25 - Third reading Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
State and local government policy bill.
Title
State and local government policy bill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 35 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 71 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - House: Franson - Amendment - H1826A17 (Y: 59 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-18 - House - House: Novotny - Amendment - H1826A13 (Y: 58 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-18 - House - House: Koznick - Amendment - H1826A11 (Y: 59 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-18 - House - House: Nadeau - Amendment - H1826A28 (Y: 57 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-18 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 71 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - House: Franson - Amendment - H1826A17 (Y: 59 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-18 - House - House: Novotny - Amendment - H1826A13 (Y: 58 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-18 - House - House: Koznick - Amendment - H1826A11 (Y: 59 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-18 - House - House: Nadeau - Amendment - H1826A28 (Y: 57 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-25 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Second reading |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF1424 |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF1424, now on General Orders |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Received from House |
2023-04-18 | House | Bill was passed as amended |
2023-04-18 | House | Third reading as amended |
2023-04-18 | House | Amended |
2023-04-17 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Tuesday, April 18, 2023 |
2023-03-30 | House | Second reading |
2023-03-30 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2023-02-15 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to State and Local Government Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1424 (Similar To) 2023-04-20 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF1826, SF indefinitely postponed