MN HF1900 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on May 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - Secretary of State Chapter 67
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on May 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - Secretary of State Chapter 67
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Environment and natural resources trust fund renewal provided and trust fund provisions modified, community grant program established, community grant program advisory council established, report required, money appropriated, and constitutional amendment proposed.
Title
Environment and natural resources trust fund renewal provided and trust fund provisions modified, community grant program established, community grant program advisory council established, report required, money appropriated, and constitutional amendment proposed.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-20 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 36 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 87 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - House - House: Torkelson - Amendment - H1900A10 (Y: 60 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-11 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 87 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - House - House: Torkelson - Amendment - H1900A10 (Y: 60 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-26 | Secretary of State Chapter 67 | |
2023-05-26 | Governor's action Approval | |
2023-05-26 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2023-05-26 | Governor approval | |
2023-05-23 | Presented to Governor | |
2023-05-21 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by the Senate |
2023-05-21 | House | Third reading as amended by the Senate |
2023-05-21 | House | Motion prevailed |
2023-05-21 | House | Motion to concur with Senate amendments |
2023-05-21 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2023-05-20 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2023-05-20 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2023-05-13 | House | Author added Myers |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Second reading |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Rule 12.10: report of votes in committee |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Received from House |
2023-05-11 | House | Bill was passed as amended |
2023-05-11 | House | Third reading as amended |
2023-05-11 | House | Amended |
2023-05-09 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, May 11, 2023 |
2023-05-08 | House | Second reading |
2023-05-08 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2023-05-04 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2023-04-27 | House | Author added Elkins |
2023-04-17 | House | Author added Hemmingsen-Jaeger |
2023-04-13 | House | Joint rule 2.03 waived |
2023-04-13 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2023-04-11 | House | Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2023-04-11 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2023-03-30 | House | Authors added Edelson and Fischer |
2023-03-28 | House | Author added Kraft |
2023-03-27 | House | Author added Rehm |
2023-03-13 | House | Authors added Stephenson, Lillie, and Long |
2023-03-09 | House | Authors added Freiberg; Feist; Sencer-Mura |
2023-03-02 | House | Author added Pursell |
2023-02-20 | House | Authors added Hansen, R.; Acomb; Jordan |
2023-02-16 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2404 (Similar To) 2023-05-11 - Re-referred to Finance