MN HF1995 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Author added Hanson, J
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Author added Hanson, J
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Practice or provision of physical therapy governing provisions modified, and criminal penalties provided.
Title
Practice or provision of physical therapy governing provisions modified, and criminal penalties provided.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | House | Author added Hanson, J |
2023-03-01 | House | Author added Engen |
2023-02-20 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3338 (Similar To) 2023-05-16 - Referred to Health and Human Services