MN HF206 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-28 - Authors added Moller and Koznick
Pending: House Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-28 - Authors added Moller and Koznick
Pending: House Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Online driver education program provided.
Title
Online driver education program provided.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-28 | House | Authors added Moller and Koznick |
2021-01-25 | House | Author added Edelson |
2021-01-21 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF255 (Similar To) 2021-02-25 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance